Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 4297 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17703 Week
» 70719 Month
» 190246 Year
» 3217099 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2171 |
28/11/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03171 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/11/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/11/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2171 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
26/09/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (50C) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03171 |
|
|
16/11/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
07/1977 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
09/1977 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
24/10/1977 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03171 |
|
|
03/1978 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|