Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 591 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6568 Week
» 22766 Month
» 187666 Year
» 698768 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2172 06/12/1960
TOPS (Tops) 03172 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 06/12/1960
Withdrawn 26/05/1976
Time in Service 15 yrs, 5 mths , 20 dys
Cut Up 01/07/1977
Cut At Cohens (Kettering)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
50B Hull Dairycoates (New) 06/12/1960
50C Hull Botanic Gardens w/e 26/09/1970
55B York (North) w/e 16/12/1972
   Withdrawn 26/05/1976


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
06/12/1960 To Service To service as D2172
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)
   
26/09/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (50C)    
16/12/1972 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (55B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03172    
26/05/1976 Withdrawn Condemned as 03172    
01/07/1977 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev