Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 326 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1192 Week
» 25854 Month
» 284713 Year
» 795815 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2178 09/01/1962

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 09/01/1962
Withdrawn 30/09/1969
Time in Service 7 yrs, 8 mths , 21 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon (New) 09/01/1962
83H Plymouth Friary 28/01/1962
83D Laira 4w/e 11/08/1962
81F Oxford 5w/e 14/06/1969
   Withdrawn 30/09/1969

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
03/12/1961 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop - under construction - motor fitted to bodyshell. SLS 1/1962 Link
09/01/1962 To Service To service as D2178
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F)
   
27/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (83H)    
11/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
14/06/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
30/09/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D2178    

prev prev