Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1044 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18847 Week
» 71863 Month
» 191390 Year
» 3218243 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D218 |
07/07/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40018 |
03/1974 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
CARMANIA |
15/07/1961 |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
07/07/1959 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/07/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/07/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D218 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
18/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
15/07/1961 |
Naming |
Named 'CARMANIA' |
|
|
28/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40018 |
|
|
14/09/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40018 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
08/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|