Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 165 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1031 Week
» 25693 Month
» 284552 Year
» 795654 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2180 01/02/1962
TOPS (Tops) 03180 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 01/02/1962
Withdrawn 31/03/1984
Time in Service 22 yrs, 1 mth , 30 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
73C Hither Green (New) 01/02/1962
70B Feltham 4w/e 17/12/1962
70F Bournemouth m/e 14/09/1964
SF Stratford 3w/e 12/07/1975
CR Colchester w/e 13/09/1975
   Withdrawn 31/03/1984

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
01/02/1962 To Service To service as D2180
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Hither Green (73C)
   
17/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F)    
08/1968 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03180    
12/07/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (SF)    
13/09/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (CR)    
31/03/1984 Withdrawn Condemned as 03180    

prev prev