Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 903 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6508 Week
» 18055 Month
» 417737 Year
» 494324 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2182 05/03/1962

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 05/03/1962
Withdrawn 11/05/1968
Time in Service 6 yrs, 2 mths , 6 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
83B Taunton (New) 05/03/1962
83C Exeter 4w/e 21/04/1962
82C Swindon 4w/e 08/09/1962
87F Llanelly 5w/e 31/08/1963
87H Whitland 4w/e 02/11/1963
87E Landore (Whitland closed) 2w/e 31/01/1966
   Stored m/e 30/07/1967
   Withdrawn 11/05/1968

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
04/03/1962 Sightings Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop.   Link
05/03/1962 To Service To service as D2182
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Taunton (83B)
   
21/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (83C)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
31/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Whitland (87H)    
31/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
30/07/1967 To Store To Store    
11/05/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D2182    

prev prev