Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 326 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1192 Week
» 25854 Month
» 284713 Year
» 795815 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2183 20/03/1962

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 20/03/1962
Withdrawn 21/09/1968
Time in Service 6 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy
Cut Up 01/03/1969
Cut At Birds (Long Marston)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
83B Taunton (New) 20/03/1962
83E St Blazey 4w/e 21/04/1962
83D Laira 4w/e 19/05/1962
84B St Blazey w/e 08/11/1964
83B Taunton 2w/e 14/05/1967
   Stored m/e 30/07/1967
87E Landore 7w/e 27/07/1968
   Withdrawn 21/09/1968


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
04/03/1962 Sightings Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop.   Link
20/03/1962 To Service To service as D2183
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Taunton (83B)
   
21/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to St Blazey (83E)    
19/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
08/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to St Blazey (84B)    
14/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
30/07/1967 To Store To Store    
27/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
21/09/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D2183    
01/03/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Birds: Long Marston    
26/07/1969 Sightings At Birds, Long Marston: In scrapyard RO489 11/69 Link

prev prev