Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 165 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1031 Week
» 25693 Month
» 284552 Year
» 795654 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2184 09/04/1962

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 09/04/1962
Withdrawn 28/12/1968
Time in Service 6 yrs, 8 mths , 19 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
87F Llanelly (New) 09/04/1962
87C Danygraig 4w/e 16/06/1962
87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 27/07/1963
87H Whitland 4w/e 02/11/1963
87E Landore (Whitland closed) 2w/e 31/01/1966
   Withdrawn 28/12/1968

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
04/03/1962 Sightings Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop.   Link
09/04/1962 To Service To service as D2184
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Llanelly (87F)
   
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Danygraig (87C)    
27/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Whitland (87H)    
31/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
28/12/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D2184    

prev prev