Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 106 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2552 Week
» 14257 Month
» 345746 Year
» 422333 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2189 31/03/1961
TOPS (Tops) 03189 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 31/03/1961
Withdrawn 16/03/1986
Time in Service 24 yrs, 11 mths , 13 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
82C Swindon (New) 31/03/1961
   Stored (at 82C) 4w/e 31/10/1967
16C Derby w/e 11/11/1967
   To Crewe Works w/e 23/12/1967
5A Crewe Diesel w/e 18/05/1968
41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 07/12/1968
   Withdrawn 16/03/1986

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
31/03/1961 To Service To service as D2189
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Swindon (82C)
   
31/10/1967 To Store To Store (at 82C)    
11/11/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (16C)    
23/12/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Works (99C)    
18/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A)    
07/12/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03189    
16/03/1986 Withdrawn Condemned as 03189    

prev prev