Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 165 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1031 Week
» 25693 Month
» 284552 Year
» 795654 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2192 05/05/1961

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 05/05/1961
Withdrawn 25/01/1969
Time in Service 7 yrs, 8 mths , 20 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
82C Swindon (New) 05/05/1961
DG Danygraig 4w/e 12/08/1961
82C Swindon 4w/e 04/11/1961
   Withdrawn 25/01/1969

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
05/05/1961 To Service To service as D2192
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Swindon (82C)
   
12/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Danygraig (DG)    
04/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
29/11/1964 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Inside the stock shed RO 1/1965 Link
25/01/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D2192    

prev prev