Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 90 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 3707 Week
» 15412 Month
» 346901 Year
» 423488 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2197 15/06/1961
TOPS (Tops) 03197 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 15/06/1961
Withdrawn 05/07/1987
Time in Service 26 yrs , 20 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 15/06/1961
83D Laira 4w/e 07/10/1961
83B Taunton 2w/e 14/05/1967
84A Laira m/e 30/06/1967
   Stored (at 84A) 4w/e 31/08/1967
70D Eastleigh 4w/e 29/01/1968
70F Bournemouth w/e 05/02/1968
91S To Southern Region 9w/e 18/03/1968
70D Eastleigh 2w/e 11/10/1968
70F Bournemouth 3w/e 05/03/1969
SG   5w/e 07/03/1974
NR Norwich Thorpe 2w/e 11/10/1975
91E To Eastern Region m/e 31/10/1975
   Withdrawn 05/07/1987

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
15/06/1961 To Service To service as D2197
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W)
   
07/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
14/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
30/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
31/08/1967 To Store To Store (at 84A)    
29/01/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
05/02/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F)    
18/03/1968 Allocation Reallocated to To Southern Region (91S)    
11/10/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
05/03/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03197    
07/03/1974 Allocation      
11/10/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NR)    
31/10/1975 Allocation Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E)    
05/07/1987 Withdrawn Condemned as 03197    

prev prev