Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 79 Today
» 844 Yesterday
» 4345 Week
» 16123 Month
» 305515 Year
» 816617 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2199 29/06/1961

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 29/06/1961
Withdrawn 18/06/1972
Time in Service 10 yrs, 11 mths , 20 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
8C Speke Junction (New) 29/06/1961
8H Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 31/12/1966
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 07/03/1970
12C Barrow in Furness w/e 09/10/1971
   Withdrawn 18/06/1972

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
29/06/1961 To Service To service as D2199
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Speke Junction (8C)
   
31/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H)    
07/03/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C)    
18/06/1972 Withdrawn Condemned as D2199    

prev prev