Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 79 Today
» 844 Yesterday
» 4345 Week
» 16123 Month
» 305515 Year
» 816617 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D22 30/03/1961
TOPS (Tops) 45132 07/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 45
Wheels 1Co-Co1
Builder Derby Works
To Service 30/03/1961
Withdrawn 11/05/1987
Time in Service 26 yrs, 1 mth , 11 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
17A Derby (New) 30/03/1961
41A Sheffield Darnall w/e 17/06/1961
17A Derby w/e 16/09/1961
52A Gateshead w/e 16/09/1961
55H Neville Hill w/e 23/06/1962
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 08/12/1962
D16 Nottingham Division w/e 17/08/1968
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 09/10/1971
TO Toton w/e 18/05/1974
   Withdrawn 11/05/1987

Modifications
Date Modified Modification

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
30/03/1961 To Service To service as D22
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H)    
08/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
17/08/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
17/08/1968 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
18/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (TO)    
07/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 45132    
28/11/1977 Sightings 1358 Penzance to Birmingham New Street  (1M74) www.45132.com  
31/03/1979 Sightings 0643 London St Pancras to Sheffield (1E06) www.45132.com  
19/07/1980 Sightings 2000 Sheffield to London St Pancras (1M84) www.45132.com  
22/07/1980 Sightings 0643 London St Pancras to Sheffield (1E06) www.45132.com  
16/10/1980 Sightings 1830 Plymouth to Cardiff (1C74) www.45132.com  
22/06/1981 Sightings 1759 Sheffield - London St.Pancras  (1M64) www.45132.com  
11/07/1981 Sightings 1500 Sheffield to London St Pancras (1M79) www.45132.com  
19/08/1981 Sightings 18:30 Nottingham - Leicester  (1F08) www.45132.com  
28/08/1981 Sightings 2210 Onto Holbeck off 1E55 www.45132.com  
04/09/1981 Sightings 2005 London St.Pancras - Sheffield  (1E78) www.45132.com  
05/09/1981 Sightings 1150 Glasgow - Nottingham  (1M86) www.45132.com  
14/09/1981 Sightings 0025 Onto Holbeck light Engine from Sheffield www.45132.com  
06/10/1981 Sightings 1750 London St.Pancras - Nottingham  (1D38) www.45132.com  
20/11/1981 Sightings 1033 Leeds to Paignton (1V86) www.45132.com  
27/11/1981 Sightings 1033 Leeds to Paignton (1V86) www.45132.com  
09/01/1982 Sightings 0750 Bristol TM to Plymouth (1B18) www.45132.com  
09/01/1982 Sightings 1618 Plymouth to Birmingham New Street (1M74) www.45132.com  
15/01/1982 Sightings 1438 Paignton to Leeds (1E70) www.45132.com  
05/03/1982 Sightings 1100 Sheffield - London St.Pancras  (1M17) www.45132.com  
06/03/1982 Sightings 2359 Sheffield to London St Pancras (1M10) www.45132.com  
07/03/1982 Sightings 0746 London St Pancras to Manchester Piccadilly (1M32) www.45132.com  
07/03/1982 Sightings 0746 London St.Pancras - Manchester Piccadilly  (1M32) www.45132.com  
18/05/1982 Sightings 1705 Nottingham - St Pancras  (1C78) www.45132.com  
08/06/1982 Sightings 1903 Derby - London St.Pancras  (1C85) www.45132.com  
13/08/1982 Sightings 1757 London St.Pancras - Nottingham  (1D58) www.45132.com  
03/09/1982 Sightings 1000 London St.Pancras - Sheffield  (1E16) www.45132.com  
07/09/1982 Sightings 0828 St.Pancras - Nottingham  (1D05) www.45132.com  
16/09/1982 Sightings 1237 Leeds - Cardiff  (1V??) www.45132.com  
26/09/1982 Sightings 0750 Nottingham - London St.Pancras  (1C02) www.45132.com  
26/09/1982 Sightings 1700 London St.Pancras - Sheffield  (1E45) www.45132.com  
30/09/1982 Sightings 2010 Nottingham - London St.Pancras  (1C87) www.45132.com  
01/10/1982 Sightings 0005 London St.Pancras - Sheffield  (1E03) www.45132.com  
02/10/1982 Sightings 10:00 Carlisle - Leeds 1M26 16:05 Leeds - Carlisle :02/10/82 45132  (1E23) www.45132.com  
23/10/1982 Sightings 0650 Leicester - Edinburgh adex  (1Z11) www.45132.com  
23/10/1982 Sightings 1805 Edinburgh - Leicester adex  (1Z11) www.45132.com  
05/03/1983 Sightings 1450 Birmingham - Leeds  (1E27) www.45132.com  
30/04/1983 Sightings 1919 Derby to London St Pancras (Paired with 45146) (1C85) www.45132.com  
30/04/1983 Sightings 2335 London St Pancras to Sheffield (1E99) www.45132.com  
04/05/1983 Sightings 1219 Derby to London St Pancras (1C49) www.45132.com  
04/05/1983 Sightings 1830 Sheffield to London St Pancras (from Nottingham) (1M64) www.45132.com  
06/05/1983 Sightings 1850 London St Pancras to Nottingham (1D58) www.45132.com  
13/05/1983 Sightings 1919 Derby - London St.Pancras  (1C85) www.45132.com  
13/05/1983 Sightings 1919 Derby to London St Pancras  (1C85) www.45132.com  
14/05/1983 Sightings 1635 London St.Pancras - Derby  (1P??) www.45132.com  
28/05/1983 Sightings 1322 Newcastle - Liverpool LS  (1M75) www.45132.com  
27/02/1984 Sightings 07:48 Leicester - Leeds (From Nottingham)  (1E05) www.45132.com  
27/02/1984 Sightings 17:35 Leeds - Sheffield  (1J01) www.45132.com  
02/03/1984 Sightings 07:48 Leicester - Leeds (From Nottingham)  (1E05) www.45132.com  
02/03/1984 Sightings 17:35 Leeds - Sheffield  (1J01) www.45132.com  
29/03/1984 Sightings 11:06 Leeds - Sheffield (1J67) www.45132.com  
29/03/1984 Sightings 1549 Sheffield - Newcastle  (1N31) www.45132.com  
15/06/1984 Sightings 12:46 FO Portsmouth - Leeds. Date:15/06/84 To BNS From BNS: 45132  (1E22) www.45132.com  
28/07/1984 Sightings 1220 Newquay - Leeds  (1E18) www.45132.com  
30/08/1984 Sightings 16:50 SX Gloucester - Weston-super-Mare  (2C48) www.45132.com  
30/08/1984 Sightings 18:45 SX Weston - Bristol TM  (2C83) www.45132.com  
05/10/1984 Sightings 1200 Departed Holbeck shed at 2140 www.45132.com  
06/10/1984 Sightings 1130 On Holbeck www.45132.com  
29/10/1984 Sightings 1635 ST. PANCRAS TO DERBY 1D54 (1D54) www.45132.com  
04/11/1984 Sightings 1840 ST. PANCRAS TO ? 1D22 (1D22) www.45132.com  
07/12/1984 Sightings 0847 Holyhead - Newcastle  (1E08) www.45132.com  
22/12/1984 Sightings 1750 Newcastle - Liverpool  (1M19) www.45132.com  
23/12/1984 Sightings 0120 ST. PANCRAS TO NOTTINGHAM 1F31 NEWSPAPERS (1F31) www.45132.com  
23/12/1984 Sightings 0540 NOTTINGHAM TO CRICKEWOOD 3C66 E.C.S (3C66) www.45132.com  
29/01/1985 Sightings 1735 ST. PANCRAS TO NOTTINGHAM 1D55 (1D55) www.45132.com  
29/01/1985 Sightings NOTTINGHAM TO DERBY 5D55 E.C.S (5D55) www.45132.com  
30/01/1985 Sightings 2015 ST. PANCRAS TO DERBY 1P30 MAIL (1P30) www.45132.com  
01/02/1985 Sightings 1735 ST. PANCRAS TO NOTTINGHAM 1D55 (1D55) www.45132.com  
01/02/1985 Sightings NOTTINGHAM TO DERBY 5D55 E.C.S (5D55) www.45132.com  
24/02/1985 Sightings 1230 Derby - St Pancras  (1C21) www.45132.com  
26/02/1985 Sightings 1305 ST. PANCRAS TO DERBY www.45132.com  
26/02/1985 Sightings 1635 St Pancras - Nottingham  (1D54) www.45132.com  
27/02/1985 Sightings 1635 St Pancras - Nottingham  (1D54) www.45132.com  
10/03/1985 Sightings 1230 Derby - St Pancras  (1C21) www.45132.com  
13/04/1985 Sightings 0427 ST. PANCRAS TO DERBY 1P06 MAIL/NEWSPAPERS (1P06) www.45132.com  
26/04/1985 Sightings 0204 ST. PANCRAS TO NOTTINGHAM 1D26 NEWSPAPERS (1D26) www.45132.com  
26/04/1985 Sightings 0420 NOTTINGHAM TO CRICKLEWOOD 3C66 E.C.S (3C66) www.45132.com  
05/05/1985 Sightings 2320(4/5) Glasgow C - Bristol, from Birmingham NS via Didcot curve  (1V62) www.45132.com  
25/05/1985 Sightings 0427 ST. PANCRAS TO DERBY 1P30 MAIL (1P30) www.45132.com  
31/05/1985 Sightings 0923 Newcastle - Penzance (diagrammed to Plymouth)  (1V85) www.45132.com  
14/07/1985 Sightings 1310 Plymouth to Manchester Piccadilly (1M78) www.45132.com  
04/08/1985 Sightings 1455 Plymouth to Newcastle (1E37) www.45132.com  
10/08/1985 Sightings 0340 ST. PANCRAS TO CRICKLEWOOD E.C.S www.45132.com  
13/08/1985 Sightings SHEFFIELD TO STPANCRAS 1M10 (1M10) www.45132.com  
31/08/1985 Sightings 2215 Newcastle to Paignton (1V58) www.45132.com  
13/09/1985 Sightings 0630 On Holbeck www.45132.com  
27/09/1985 Sightings Liverpool - Newcastle  (1E88) www.45132.com  
18/10/1985 Sightings 0427 ST. PANCRAS TO DERBY 1P06 MAIL/NEWSPAPERS (1P06) www.45132.com  
19/10/1985 Sightings 0204 ST. PANCRAS TO NOTTINGHAM 1D26 NEWSPAPERS (1D26) www.45132.com  
19/10/1985 Sightings 0420 NOTTINGHAM TO CRICKLEWOOD 3C66 E.C.S (3C66) www.45132.com  
19/10/1985 Sightings ???? Journey included Sheffield - Rotherham (2Y18) www.45132.com  
23/10/1985 Sightings 0204 ST. PANCRAS TO NOTTINGHAM 1D26 NEWSPAPERS (1D26) www.45132.com  
23/10/1985 Sightings 0420 NOTTINGHAM CRICKLEWOOD 3C66 E.C.S (3C66) www.45132.com  
01/11/1985 Sightings 0345 ST. PANCRAS TO ST,ALBANS 1C03 NEWSPAPERS (1C03) www.45132.com  
01/11/1985 Sightings 2015 ST. PANCRAS TO DERBY 1P30 MAIL (1P30) www.45132.com  
15/12/1985 Sightings 1945 ST. PANCRAS TO DERBY 1P24 (1P24) www.45132.com  
21/12/1985 Sightings 0335 TOTON TO CRICKLEWOOD 6O39 (6O39) www.45132.com  
05/04/1986 Sightings 0240 TOTON TO CRICKLEWOOD 6A83 (6A83) www.45132.com  
05/04/1986 Sightings 0303 CRICKLEWOOD TO TOTON 0Z00 (0Z00) www.45132.com  
08/04/1986 Sightings 1735 ST. PANCRAS TO NOTTINGHAM 1D55 (1D55) www.45132.com  
08/04/1986 Sightings NOTTINGHAM TO DERBY 5D55 E.C.S (5D55) www.45132.com  
10/04/1986 Sightings CRICKLEWOOD TO NEESDON 0O97 (0O97) www.45132.com  
10/04/1986 Sightings CRICKLEWOOD TO ST. PANCRAS 0T97 (0T97) www.45132.com  
10/04/1986 Sightings ST. PANCRAS TO CRICKLEWOOD OT97 (0T97) www.45132.com  
17/04/1986 Sightings CLIFFHILL TO CRICKLEWOOD 6O74 TONBRIDGE STONE (6O74) www.45132.com  
17/04/1986 Sightings CRICKLEWOOD TO T M D 0ZOO (0Z00) www.45132.com  
31/05/1986 Sightings Newcastle - Liverpool  (1M76) www.45132.com  
24/09/1986 Sightings 1846 CLIFFHILL TO CRICKLEWOOD 6O74 TONBRIDGE STONE (6O74) www.45132.com  
24/09/1986 Sightings 1855 CRICKLEWOOD TO T M D 0ZOO (0Z00) www.45132.com  
15/12/1986 Sightings 1735 ST. PANCRAS TO NOTTINGHAM 1P13 (1P13) www.45132.com  
15/12/1986 Sightings NOTTINGHAN TO DERBY 5P13 E.C.S (5P13) www.45132.com  
22/12/1986 Sightings 1625 CRICKLEWOOD TO ST. PANCRAS 5P13 E.C.S (5P13) www.45132.com  
28/12/1986 Sightings DERBY TO ST. PANCRAS 1C22 (1C22) www.45132.com  
29/12/1986 Sightings 0005 ST. PANCRAS TO SHEFFIELD 1E99 (1E99) www.45132.com  
29/12/1986 Sightings SHEFFIELD TO DERBY 5E99 E.C.S (5E99) www.45132.com  
30/12/1986 Sightings 0204 ST. PANCRAS TO NOTTINGHAM 1D26 NEWSPAPERS (1D26) www.45132.com  
30/12/1986 Sightings 0420 NOTTINGHAM TO CRICKLEWOOD 3C66 E.C.S (3C66) www.45132.com  
12/01/1987 Sightings 0005 ST. PANCRAS TO SHEFFIELD 1E99 (1E99) www.45132.com  
12/01/1987 Sightings SHEFFIELD TO DERBY 5E99 E.C.S (5E99) www.45132.com  
07/02/1987 Sightings 2320 ST. PANCRAS TO NOTTINGHAM NEWSPAPERS www.45132.com  
11/02/1987 Sightings 2045 T M D TO CRICKLEWOOD OZOO (0Z00) www.45132.com  
11/02/1987 Sightings 2116 CRICKLEWOOD TO TINSLEY 6E99 (6E99) www.45132.com  
04/03/1987 Sightings 0110 ST. PANCRAS TO DERBY MAIL /NEWSPAPERS www.45132.com  
05/03/1987 Sightings 2225 ST. PANCRAS TO DERBY T.P.O www.45132.com  
08/03/1987 Sightings 0110 ST. PANCRAS TO DERBY MAIL /NEWSPAPERS www.45132.com  
10/03/1987 Sightings 0005 ST. PANCRAS TO SHEFFIELD 1E99 (1E99) www.45132.com  
10/03/1987 Sightings SHEFFIELD TO DERBY 5E99 E.C.S (5E99) www.45132.com  
11/03/1987 Sightings SHEFFIELD TO ST. PANCRAS 1M10 (1M10) www.45132.com  
12/03/1987 Sightings 0005 ST. PANCRAS TO SHEFFIELD 1E99 (1E99) www.45132.com  
12/03/1987 Sightings SHEFIELD TO DERBY 5E99 E.C.S (5E99) www.45132.com  
13/03/1987 Sightings 2015 SR,PANCRAS TO DERBY 1P30 MAIL (1P30) www.45132.com  
14/03/1987 Sightings 0345 ST. PANCRAS TO ST,ALBANS 1C03 NEWSPAPERS (1C03) www.45132.com  
15/03/1987 Sightings 0020 ST. PANCRAS TO DERBY NEWSPAPERS www.45132.com  
16/03/1987 Sightings 0427 ST. PANCRAS TO DERBY 1P06 MAIL/NEWSPAPERS (1P06) www.45132.com  
18/03/1987 Sightings 0345 ST. PANCRAS TO ST,ALBANS 1C03 NEWSPAPERS (1C03) www.45132.com  
19/03/1987 Sightings 0005 ST ,PANCRAS TO SHEFFIELD 1E99 (1E99) www.45132.com  
19/03/1987 Sightings SHEFFIELD TO DERBY 5E99 E.C.S (5E99) www.45132.com  
21/03/1987 Sightings 0204 ST. PANCRAS TO NOTTINGHAM 1D26 NEWSPAPERS (1D26) www.45132.com  
21/03/1987 Sightings 0420 NOTTINGHAM TO CRICKLEWOOD 3C66 E.C.S (3C66) www.45132.com  
22/03/1987 Sightings 0020 ST. PANCRAS TO DERBY NEWSPAPERS www.45132.com  
23/03/1987 Sightings 0005 ST. PANCRAS TO SHEFFIELD 1E99 (1E99) www.45132.com  
23/03/1987 Sightings SHEFFIELD TO DERBY 5E99 E.C.S (5E99) www.45132.com  
27/03/1987 Sightings 0204 ST. PANCRAS TO NOTTINGHAM 1D26 NEWSPAPERS (1D26) www.45132.com  
27/03/1987 Sightings 0420 NOTTINGHAM TO CRICKLEWOOD 3C66 E.C.S (3C66) www.45132.com  
28/03/1987 Sightings 2320 ST. PANCRAS TO SHEFFIELD NEWSPAPERS www.45132.com  
16/04/1987 Sightings 0204 ST. PANCRAS TO NOTTINGHAM 1D26 NEWSPAPERS (1D26) www.45132.com  
16/04/1987 Sightings 0420 NOTTINGHAM 3C66 E.C.S (3C66) www.45132.com  
17/04/1987 Sightings 0427 ST. PANCRAS TO DERBY 1P06 MAIL NEWSPAPERS (1P06) www.45132.com  
19/04/1987 Sightings 0120 ST. PANCRAS TO NOTTINGHAM 1F31 NEWSPAPERS (1F31) www.45132.com  
19/04/1987 Sightings 0520 NOTTINGHAM TO CRICKLEWOOD 3C66 E.C.S (3C66) www.45132.com  
19/04/1987 Sightings 1620 ST. PANCRAS TO ? 1P20 (1P20) www.45132.com  
28/04/1987 Sightings 0427 ST. PANCRAS TO DERBY 1P06 MAIL/NEWSPAPERS (1P06) www.45132.com  
28/04/1987 Sightings 1635 ST. PANCRAS TO DERBY 1D54 (1D54) www.45132.com  
29/04/1987 Sightings 0427 ST. PANCRAS TO DERBY 1P06 MAIL/NEWSPAPERS (1P06) www.45132.com  
02/05/1987 Sightings 0204 ST. PANCRAS TO NOTTINGHAM 1P30 MAIL (1P30) www.45132.com  
02/05/1987 Sightings 0420 NOTTINGHAM TO CRICKLEWOOD 3C66 E.C.S (3C66) www.45132.com  
03/05/1987 Sightings 0120 ST. PANCRAS TO NOTTINGHAM 1F31 NEWSPAPERS (1F31) www.45132.com  
03/05/1987 Sightings 0520 NOTTINGHAM TO CRICKLEWOOD 3C66 E.C.S (3C66) www.45132.com  
04/05/1987 Sightings 0110 ST. PANCRAS TO DERBY MAIL/NEWSPAPERS www.45132.com  
04/05/1987 Sightings 1735 ST. PANCRAS TO NOTTINGHAM 1D54 (1D54) www.45132.com  
04/05/1987 Sightings NOTTINGHAM TO DERBY 5D54 E.C.S (5D54) www.45132.com  
07/05/1987 Sightings 1735 ST. PANCRAS TO NOTTINGHAM 1D54 (1D54) www.45132.com  
07/05/1987 Sightings NOTTINGHAM TO DERBY 5D54 E.C.S (5D54) www.45132.com  
08/05/1987 Sightings 1735 ST. PANCRAS TO NOTTINGHAM 1D54 (1D54) www.45132.com  
08/05/1987 Sightings NOTTINGHAM TO DERBY 5D54 E.C.S (5D54) www.45132.com  
11/05/1987 Withdrawn Condemned as 45132    

prev prev