Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 777 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 4394 Week
» 16099 Month
» 347588 Year
» 424175 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 11103 19/07/1952
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2203 01/11/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 04
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
To Service 19/07/1952
Withdrawn 16/12/1967
Time in Service 15 yrs, 4 mths , 27 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31B March (New) 19/07/1952
32E Yarmouth Vauxhall 5w/e 23/08/1952
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 27/02/1960
   To Crewe Works w/e 17/09/1966
   Withdrawn 16/12/1967

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
19/07/1952 To Service To service as 11103
Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
Allocated to March (31B)
   
23/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth Vauxhall (32E)    
15/11/1958 Renumbered Renumbered to D2203    
27/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
17/09/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Works (99C)    
16/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D2203    

prev prev