Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 388 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 1260 Week
» 13038 Month
» 302430 Year
» 813532 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 11108 14/02/1953
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2207 23/10/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 04
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
To Service 14/02/1953
Withdrawn 16/12/1967
Time in Service 14 yrs, 10 mths , 2 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30F Parkeston Quay (New) 14/02/1953
34A Kings Cross w/e 23/10/1954
40B Immingham 5w/e 22/10/1955
40E Colwick w/e 19/10/1963
31B March w/e 15/08/1964
9D Newton Heath w/e 17/09/1966
   To Crewe Works w/e 24/09/1966
   Withdrawn 16/12/1967

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
14/02/1953 To Service To service as 11108
Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
Allocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)
   
23/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
22/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
15/11/1958 Renumbered Renumbered to D2207    
19/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
15/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
17/09/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
24/09/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Works (99C)    
16/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D2207    

prev prev