Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 835 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4695 Week
» 7277 Month
» 271910 Year
» 1493475 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 2210 m/e 09/1939

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 2251
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 322
To Service During 09/1939
Withdrawal During 06/1965
Scrapping During 09/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 25 yrs , 9 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1939
84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 01/11/1958
81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 28/11/1959
89B Croes Newydd 4w/e 17/06/1961
84D Leamington 4w/e 07/10/1961
2D Banbury w/e 14/11/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 89B Croes Newydd 4w/e 17/06/1961
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 07/10/1961
ALLOC 2D Banbury 4w/e 05/12/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/11/1959 Brecon demotion Brecon's allocation was divided from 2nd November, 1959-2219/36, 3638, 3706/47/67, 7794 to Newport (86A) and 46506/16/8/9/20/1/2 to Oswestry (89A) thus making the shed an overnight stabling depot. SLS/196002
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303
20/09/1964 Swindon Works (Erecting Shop) On the occasion of the Society farewell to the last G.W.R. County class tour, the following were on works:- Erecting Shop: D602, D806/19/37/43/9, D1001/6/9/14/15/28/32/43/58, D6335/57, D7009/73, 2210, 6862, 6951, 7803, 7924, 43001/137, 73034 an 92223. New Construction: D9512 complete and painted, D9513-6 almost complete, D9517-24 under construction. Top end of shop, PWM653, D3026/32/190/807/14/24. Weighing shed: D850, D1049, Outside in works yard: 4659, 8405/9, 8732, 9425/27, 42954/78, 43115/20, 60941/45, D1016/24, D6352, D7048, N.C.B. 0-6-2T (ex T.V.R.) and King 6000 (for movement to Stratford). Scrap yard: 2818, 5698, 6010, 6824/7/73, 7929, 8418, 9484, 60809/12/33/6/87, 60916/22/5/32/64/75, 43012/112. Stock shed: D3352, D6826, D9510/11. SLS/196410
11/10/1964 Swindon Works (Erecting shop) Erecting shop: D602, D806/15/7/32/7/43/9, D1006/16/24/32/58/60/72, D3025/32/190/807/20/966, D6335/52/6, D7017/46/63, 2210, 6823/7, 6951, 7924/9, 42945/75, 43001/112/20/37, 73034, 92223, D9515/6 Painted, D9517-20 Cabs, D9521-7 Motors, D9528/9 Frames; PWM653; C shop area: NCB 67 (ex-TVR) and 6000 still awaiting movement to Stratford; 2818, 3748, 4626, 5264, 5602, 6010, 6824/73, 8401/18, 9484, 9752, 43003, 60809/12/56/87/916/22/32/41/5, 78009; Outside Erecting shop: 7803, 43012; Turntable area: D830/60, D1010/20, D3437, D7022/7/64, 4659, 8405/9, 9425, 9454, 42954; Stored Stock shed: 1010/2/4, 3702, 4569, 4916, 5963/75, 6804, 73012 SLS/196411

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1939 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 2210
Built at Swindon Works
   
01/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
28/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (89B)    
07/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
14/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (2D)    
06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 2210    

prev prev