Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 290 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18093 Week
» 71109 Month
» 190636 Year
» 3217489 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
2218 |
on |
10/06/1940 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
2251 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
337 |
To Service |
Fri 10/06/1940 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 13/11/1964 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 5 mths , 3 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
09/02/1963 |
ALLOC |
83C |
Westbury |
4w/e |
30/11/1963 |
ALLOC |
83G |
Templecombe (S&D) |
5w/e |
30/03/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
2w/e |
28/11/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
02/11/1959 |
Brecon demotion |
Brecon's allocation was divided from 2nd November, 1959-2219/36, 3638, 3706/47/67, 7794 to Newport (86A) and 46506/16/8/9/20/1/2 to Oswestry (89A) thus making the shed an overnight stabling depot. |
SLS/196002 |
22/04/1962 |
Brecon MPD |
Despite the allocation of code 88K since January, 1961, no locomotive allocation has been made or shed plates cast; Ebbw Junc. and Oswestry supply locomotives as before. On 22nd April, the following were on shed-2218/40/7, 3691, 3706/14 of 86A and 46507/9/10/21/3 of 89D. Normally, two Brecon engines stable at Builth Road H.L. shed and on 22nd April these were 46508/19 of 89D. |
SLS/196206 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/06/1940 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 2218 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
29/12/1945 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westbury (83C) |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (82G) |
|
|
13/11/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2218 |
|
|
04/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|