Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 586 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 586 Week
» 19912 Month
» 246673 Year
» 757775 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 11135 28/11/1955
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2229 29/10/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 04
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
To Service 28/11/1955
Withdrawn 31/12/1969
Time in Service 14 yrs, 1 mth , 3 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 28/11/1955
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 14/09/1963
32B Ipswich w/e 21/09/1963
31B March w/e 05/10/1963
52A Gateshead 4w/e 20/07/1968
   Withdrawn 31/12/1969

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to D2229    
28/11/1955 To Service To service as 11135
Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
21/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
05/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
20/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
31/12/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as 11135    

prev prev