Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1112 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5686 Week
» 33644 Month
» 68286 Year
» 1289851 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 2241   29/03/1945

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 2251
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Fri 29/03/1945
Withdrawal During 02/1964
Scrapping During 08/1964
Service Life 18 yrs, 10 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
85C Hereford 4w/e 17/05/1958
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 27/07/1963
86C Hereford 5w/e 31/08/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 85C Hereford 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 27/07/1963
ALLOC 86C Hereford 5w/e 31/08/1963
WDN   4w/e 24/02/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1945 To Service To service as GWR Number 2241
Built at Swindon Works
   
17/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (85C)    
27/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
31/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (86C)    
02/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 2241    

prev prev