Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 798 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5399 Week
» 16946 Month
» 416628 Year
» 493215 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 11215 12/11/1956
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2245 27/02/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 04
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
To Service 12/11/1956
Withdrawn 28/12/1968
Time in Service 12 yrs, 1 mth , 16 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
50B Neville Hill (New) 12/11/1956
50C Selby w/e 20/06/1959
50A York (North) w/e 11/07/1959
50D Goole 4w/e 09/09/1967
   Withdrawn 28/12/1968

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
12/11/1956 To Service To service as 11215
Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
Allocated to Neville Hill (50B)
   
14/03/1959 Renumbered Renumbered to D2245    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (50C)    
11/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
09/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (50D)    
28/12/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D2245    

prev prev