Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 817 Today
» 986 Yesterday
» 2725 Week
» 18923 Month
» 183823 Year
» 694925 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 11216 06/12/1956
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2246 12/03/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 04
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
To Service 06/12/1956
Withdrawn 08/07/1968
Time in Service 11 yrs, 7 mths , 2 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
50B Neville Hill (New) 06/12/1956
55G Huddersfield Hillhouse 4w/e 10/09/1966
55D Royston 4w/e 28/01/1967
56A Knottingley 4w/e 12/08/1967
   Withdrawn 08/07/1968

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
06/12/1956 To Service To service as 11216
Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
Allocated to Neville Hill (50B)
   
14/03/1959 Renumbered Renumbered to D2246    
11/11/1961 Sightings Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard. SLS 1/1962 Link
10/09/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield (55G)    
28/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (55D)    
12/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Knottingley (56A)    
08/07/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D2246    

prev prev