Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 5242 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20854 Week
» 119499 Month
» 322163 Year
» 3349016 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D225 |
17/08/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40025 |
03/1974 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
LUSITANIA |
21/04/1962 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
17/08/1959 to Crewe North (5A) |
Withdrawn |
17/10/1982 |
Time in Service |
23 yrs , 2 mths |
Cut Up |
m/e 05/1985 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
17/08/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1971 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/08/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
28/08/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/08/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D225 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
19/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
14/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
28/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
27/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
21/04/1962 |
Naming |
Named 'LUSITANIA' |
|
|
20/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
01/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
28/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
21/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
13/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
03/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40025 |
|
|
17/10/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40025 |
|
|
05/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|