Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 931 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18734 Week
» 71750 Month
» 191277 Year
» 3218130 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
2257 |
m/e |
04/1930 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
2251 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
261 |
To Service |
During 04/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 01/09/1964 |
Service Life |
34 yrs, 5 mths , 1 dy |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
02/01/1961 |
Leamington MPD |
Stratford-on-Avon sub-shed was transferred from Tyseley-Leamington w.e.f. 2/1/61 with its allocation of 4 Colletts (2211/57/67, 3217) to cover two pilot jobs, banking duties and spare engine for SMJ line. (2257 worked to Blisworth during December). |
SLS/196103 |
27/01/1963 |
Wolverhampton Works (In Yard) |
In Works: 1013/24, 1656/64, 2855, 3628(86G), 3788, 4136, 5244(86B), 6357(87C), 6692, 6975(87A), 7213, 7443, 7824, 8405/37/64, 8720, 9612/69, 9724. In Yard: 2257, 6915/6(89A), 9768. |
SLS/196302 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 2257 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tyseley (TYS) |
|
|
24/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS) |
|
|
31/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS) |
|
|
31/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS) |
|
|
18/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS) |
|
|
16/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS) |
|
|
15/07/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
28/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
31/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
16/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
30/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
14/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
31/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Croes Newydd (84J) |
|
|
31/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Croes Newydd (84J) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
03/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leamington (84D) |
|
|
14/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Croes Newydd (89B) |
|
|
15/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
01/09/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2257 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|