Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 895 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6500 Week
» 18047 Month
» 417729 Year
» 494316 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2267 20/01/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 04
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
To Service 20/01/1958
Withdrawn 31/12/1969
Time in Service 11 yrs, 11 mths , 11 dys
Cut Up 01/04/2003
Cut At Mid Norfolk Railway (Dereham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
55D Royston (New) 20/01/1958
56G Bradford Hammerton Street w/e 23/04/1960
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 18/06/1960
55H Neville Hill w/e 13/06/1964
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 12/09/1964
55B York (North) w/e 14/12/1968
50D Goole w/e 25/01/1969
   Withdrawn 31/12/1969

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
20/01/1958 To Service To service as D2267
Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
Allocated to Royston (55D)
   
23/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
13/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
14/12/1968 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (55B)    
25/01/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (50D)    
31/12/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D2267    
01/04/2003 Scrapped Broken up by Mid Norfolk Railway: Dereham    

prev prev