Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 685 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 685 Week
» 11978 Month
» 276611 Year
» 1498176 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 2267 m/e 06/1930

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 2251
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 261
To Service During 06/1930
Withdrawal Tue 21/11/1961
Scrapping During 03/1962
Service Life 31 yrs, 5 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1930
89C Machynlleth 4w/e 21/04/1956
85A Worcester 4w/e 25/01/1958
84E Tyseley 4w/e 21/02/1959
84D Leamington 4w/e 03/12/1960
   Withdrawn on 21/11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 21/04/1956
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 03/12/1960
WDN   m/e 30/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1949 Swindon Works New Work August: Nos. 7025 Sudeley Castle PDN (2/8), 7026 Tenby Castle (15/8), 7027 Thornbury Castle LA (25/8); 1503 PDN (8/8), 1504 PDN (17/8), 1505 PDN (29/8). Nos. 7025-27 are painted dark green and lined, while Nos. 1503-05 are unlined black. Contractor built: Nos. 8400 TYS, 8401 CDF, 8402 (W.G.B. 2912/49) PILL (26/8), 8450 (Y.E. Co. 2443/49) NPT (17/8). Nos. 8400-02/50 are unlined black. Condemned: Nos. 289 (original T.V. R/T boiler and curved top tanks), 1884 (closed cab), 1930 (open cab), 2902, 3182 an 3419. No. 6320 has been re-converted to coal-burning. Locomotives entering Works during August included: Nos. 1000/04/25, 1427/37, 2117 (closed cab), 2211/12/14/21/67, 2462, 2815/52/75/87, 3016/20, 3174/86, 3635/77, 3715/99, 3805/14/43, 4013/15/33/47/80, 4107/48/49/55, 4269/78, 4502/10/59/65/82/92/95, 4637/50/79/97, 4906/51/81, 5001/18/30/42/57/76/80/94/99, 5206, 5344/45/80, 5501/05/22/37/54, 5749, 5804, 5904/12/21/27/44/45/47/66, 6000/04/19, 6105/07/43/61, 6338/77, 6408/31, 6741, 6808/19/28/29/44, 6905/65, 7219/36, 7310, 7414, 7718, 7815/16, 7904, 8789, 9638 an 90712. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1005/12, 4901/23/50, 5912/18 an 6920. September: A batch of new Class '2' 2-6-2T's and Class '4' 2-6-0's is to be built here. They will be similar to existing L.M.S. designs, but will have modified G.W.R. boilers. The frames have already been cut for five of the 2-6-0's. SLS/194910
02/01/1961 Leamington MPD Stratford-on-Avon sub-shed was transferred from Tyseley-Leamington w.e.f. 2/1/61 with its allocation of 4 Colletts (2211/57/67, 3217) to cover two pilot jobs, banking duties and spare engine for SMJ line. (2257 worked to Blisworth during December). SLS/196103
31/08/1961 Leamington During August 'Jintie' 47539 (85C) appeared on the Nuneaton parcels turn but early in September was placed in store at rear of shed; 2267 is in store also, minus number plates. SLS/196110

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1930 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 2267
Built at Swindon Works
   
21/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
03/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 2267    

prev prev