Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 873 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14279 Week
» 67295 Month
» 186822 Year
» 3213675 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D227 |
24/08/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40027 |
28/12/1973 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
PARTHIA |
14/07/1962 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
24/08/1959 to Longsight (9A) |
Withdrawn |
24/04/1983 |
Time in Service |
23 yrs , 8 mths |
Cut Up |
04/1984 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
Information |
Main generator burnt out |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
24/08/1959 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
08/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/08/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
08/1973 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
04/03/1964 |
Severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/08/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D227 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Longsight (9A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
19/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
20/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
10/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
12/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
14/07/1962 |
Naming |
Named 'PARTHIA' |
|
|
28/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
27/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
08/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
28/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40027 |
|
|
24/04/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40027 |
|
|
04/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|