Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 824 Today
» 986 Yesterday
» 2732 Week
» 18930 Month
» 183830 Year
» 694932 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2271 14/03/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 04
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
To Service 14/03/1958
Withdrawn 31/12/1969
Time in Service 11 yrs, 9 mths , 17 dys
Cut Up 15/05/1982
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
55B Stourton (New) 14/03/1958
55A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 12/04/1958
55D Royston 4w/e 20/05/1967
55F Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 20/07/1968
   Withdrawn 31/12/1969

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
14/03/1958 To Service To service as D2271
Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
Allocated to Stourton (55B)
   
12/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
20/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (55D)    
17/09/1967 Sightings A visit to Royston (Yorkshire) shed: On shed John Thickitt Link
20/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (55F)    
31/12/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D2271    

prev prev