Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 143 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6120 Week
» 22318 Month
» 187218 Year
» 698320 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2272 28/03/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 04
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
To Service 28/03/1958
Withdrawn 24/10/1970
Time in Service 12 yrs, 6 mths , 26 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
55A Holbeck (MR) (New) 28/03/1958
55D Royston 4w/e 20/05/1967
55F Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 20/07/1968
   Withdrawn 24/10/1970

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
28/03/1958 To Service To service as D2272
Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
Allocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)
   
20/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (55D)    
17/09/1967 Sightings A visit to Royston (Yorkshire) shed: On shed John Thickitt Link
20/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (55F)    
24/10/1970 Withdrawn Condemned as D2272    

prev prev