Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 326 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1192 Week
» 25854 Month
» 284713 Year
» 795815 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2279 15/02/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 04
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
To Service 15/02/1960
Withdrawn 23/05/1971
Time in Service 11 yrs, 3 mths , 8 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
75C Norwood Junction (New) 15/02/1960
30F Parkeston Quay w/e 28/05/1966
30E Colchester w/e 07/01/1967
40A Lincoln w/e 28/10/1967
30E Colchester w/e 13/09/1969
   Withdrawn 23/05/1971

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
15/02/1960 To Service To service as D2279
Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
Allocated to Norwood Junction (75C)
   
28/05/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
07/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
28/10/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
13/09/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
23/05/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as D2279    

prev prev