Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 813 Today
» 986 Yesterday
» 2721 Week
» 18919 Month
» 183819 Year
» 694921 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2280 25/02/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 04
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
To Service 25/02/1960
Withdrawn 14/03/1971
Time in Service 11 yrs , 17 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
75C Norwood Junction (New) 25/02/1960
75A Brighton 4w/e 01/05/1962
70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 18/01/1965
30F Parkeston Quay w/e 28/05/1966
30E Colchester w/e 07/01/1967
30A Stratford w/e 28/10/1967
30E Colchester w/e 26/10/1968
   Withdrawn 14/03/1971

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
25/02/1960 To Service To service as D2280
Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
Allocated to Norwood Junction (75C)
   
01/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
18/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Weymouth (70G)    
28/05/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
07/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
28/10/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
26/10/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
14/03/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as D2280    

prev prev