Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 327 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1193 Week
» 25855 Month
» 284714 Year
» 795816 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2281 27/02/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 04
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
To Service 27/02/1960
Withdrawn 20/10/1968
Time in Service 8 yrs, 7 mths , 23 dys
Cut Up 01/08/1971
Cut At Duport Steels (Briton Ferry)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
75A Brighton (New) 27/02/1960
32B Ipswich w/e 28/05/1966
30E Colchester w/e 11/05/1968
   Withdrawn 20/10/1968


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
27/02/1960 To Service To service as D2281
Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
Allocated to Brighton (75A)
   
28/05/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
20/10/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D2281    
01/08/1971 Scrapped Broken up by Duport Steels: Briton Ferry    

prev prev