Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 794 Today
» 986 Yesterday
» 2702 Week
» 18900 Month
» 183800 Year
» 694902 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2284 25/03/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 04
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
To Service 25/03/1960
Withdrawn 11/04/1971
Time in Service 11 yrs , 17 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
73C Hither Green (New) 25/03/1960
70C Guildford 4w/e 01/05/1962
32B Ipswich w/e 28/05/1966
30E Colchester w/e 11/05/1968
   Withdrawn 11/04/1971

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
25/03/1960 To Service To service as D2284
Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
Allocated to Hither Green (73C)
   
01/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
28/05/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
11/04/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as D2284    
23/12/1971 Sightings NCB North Gawber Colliery, Mapplewell - Still in BR livery RO 4/1972  

prev prev