Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 17 Today
» 772 Yesterday
» 3439 Week
» 15217 Month
» 304609 Year
» 815711 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2289 29/04/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 04
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
To Service 29/04/1960
Withdrawn 30/09/1971
Time in Service 11 yrs, 5 mths , 1 dy
Information This locomotive has recently (2018) been bought for preservation from Lonato S.p.A., Brescia, Italy where it had been in use as recently as 2009 having been exported in April 1972.
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
71A Eastleigh (New) 29/04/1960
75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 08/06/1965
75A Brighton 4w/e 22/08/1966
75C Selhurst 4w/e 19/09/1966
70D Eastleigh 4w/e 01/01/1968
   Withdrawn 30/09/1971

Preservation
Preservation Date 06/2018
Current Status Under Restoration/Overhaul
Status Date 17/09/2018
Information This shunter was exported to Italy in 1972 and worked at a steelworks in Brescia until at least 2009. It has lain stored since then until purchase in 2018 by the Heritage Shunters Trust and was repatriated to the UK in June 2018.


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
29/04/1960 To Service To service as D2289
Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
Allocated to Eastleigh (71A)
   
08/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
22/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
19/09/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Selhurst (75C)    
01/01/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
30/09/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as D2289    

prev prev