|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1949 | Swindon Works | New Work March: Nos. *7901 Dodington Hall (23/3), *7902 Eaton Mascot Hall (31/3); 9675 MTHR 4/3), 9676 CYS (10/3), 9677 CED (17/3). *Not allocated. Locomotives entering Works 28/2/49 to 30/3/49: Nos. 1002/09, 1086 (re-numbered 1147), 1213 (re-numbered 9), 1415, 1758 SDN (condemned), 1894 NPT (condemned), 2011/12, 2226/40/92/99, 2724 CYS (condemned), 69, 2806/36/71/82/83, 2902/15/31/81/87, 3032/33/43, 3175, 3386, 3562 OXF (condemned), 3616/45/55/88, 3719/44/47, 3819/29, 3901/55 (both for re-conversion), 4000/03/07/13/49, 4213/37/60/70, 4527/35/38/58/65/69/98, 4624, 4703, 4806/51 (both for re-conversion), 4936/55, 5020/33/55/57/75/89/91/95, 5166, 5310/30/41/72/96, 5509/66, 5719/28/98, 5931/79/88, 6017/24/25/28, 6132/53, 6341/53, 6720/47, 6803/22/54, 6900/02/07/33/46/55/62/64, 7202/09, 7302, 7415, 7766/84, 8753, 9311, 9600, 9704/08 and Class '8' W.D. 77234 (re-numbered 90201). Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include:-Nos. 1002/28, 2947, 4990, 6917/24, while Nos. 4007/20 are painted green and also lined. Works' pilots recently have been:-Nos. *212/13/46 and **1900. *Condemned 7/48. **Condemned 4/48. No. 3150 has been fitted with the curved front end frames and cylinders (outside steam pipes) of No. 3184 (condemned in 1948). The original frames of No. 3150 had a square front end and the cylinders had internal steam pipes. No. 2123 has been fitted with auto gear. |
SLS/194905 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
31/01/1938 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 2292 Built at Swindon Works |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Tyseley (TYS) | ||
10/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS) | ||
07/08/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS) | ||
04/09/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS) | ||
30/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS) | ||
25/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS) | ||
29/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS) | ||
16/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS) | ||
05/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS) | ||
17/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C) | ||
31/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) | ||
14/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) | ||
31/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) | ||
30/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) | ||
31/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) | ||
14/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C) | ||
30/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) | ||
29/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Oxford (81F) | ||
11/07/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) | ||
17/07/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Croes Newydd (84J) | ||
09/10/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) | ||
22/06/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 2292 | ||
09/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |