Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3584 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22495 Week
» 87449 Month
» 290113 Year
» 3316966 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
2293 |
on |
02/02/1938 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
2251 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
312 |
To Service |
Mon 02/02/1938 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 20/07/1959 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 5 mths , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
02/02/1938 |
SPM |
|
St Philips Marsh |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
82C |
|
Swindon |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
20/07/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
82C |
Swindon |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/07/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/02/1938 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 2293 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Philips Marsh (SPM) |
|
|
31/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
20/07/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2293 |
|
|
10/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|