Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 165 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1031 Week
» 25693 Month
» 284552 Year
» 795654 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2298 11/10/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 04
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
Works Number 2679
To Service 11/10/1960
Withdrawn 28/12/1968
Time in Service 8 yrs, 2 mths , 17 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
40A Lincoln (New) 11/10/1960
40F Boston w/e 03/08/1963
40E Colwick w/e 19/10/1963
40A Lincoln w/e 13/11/1965
91N To North Eastern Region w/e 20/07/1968
52A Gateshead 4w/e 20/07/1968
   Withdrawn 28/12/1968

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
11/10/1960 To Service To service as D2298
Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd., Works Number 2679
Allocated to Lincoln (40A)
   
03/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (40F)    
19/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
13/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
20/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
20/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N)    
28/12/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D2298    

prev prev