Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 2985 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16391 Week
» 69407 Month
» 188934 Year
» 3215787 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3022 |
|
05/1891 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean |
Class |
3021 |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-2-2 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
86 |
Works Number |
1262 |
To Service |
During 05/1891 |
Withdrawal |
During 02/1909 |
Service Life |
17 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1947 |
Swindon Works |
Locos. entering Works during September included: Nos. 1005, 1925, 1935, 2112, 2148, 2195, 2444, 2551, 2612, 3005, 3017, 3022, 3023, 5318, 5319, 5335, 5398, W.D. 77368, 78543 an 79274. Works' pilots recently have been: Nos. 200, 2723, 2731, 2733 an 2768. No. 5049 CDF (ex Works 23/9) has been fitted with an experimental Swindon design mechanical lubricator (similar to that fitted to No. 4905) and also a 4-row superheater. The present batch of new 'Hall' Class locos. which are of the modified or '6959' Class are being fitted with straight sided tenders; No. 6974 and onwards are being lined out. |
SLS/194711 |
21/10/1948 |
Swindon Stock Shed (Newburn Wagon Repair) |
On 21/10 the Stock Shed contained the following:-Nos. 5, 3012/14/15/17/18/23/41, 3900/54/55, 4081, 4502, 4914, 4801/06/08/10/51/55/57, 6320 while those observed at the Newburn Wagon Repair Shed were Nos. 3022/24/36, 3377/83/93, 3406/07/44/47/49, 3450/51/54, 3901/03/52, 4803/05/07/09/11/53/54/56, 9024/83/84/89. Nos. 3904/50 an 4804 have been re-converted to coal-burning and re-numbered *4972, 5955 and 2839 respectively. *Still retains electric lighting equipment. |
SLS/194812 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1891 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3022, name: ROUGEMONT Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1262 |
|
|
1898 |
Naming |
Renamed 'BESSEMER' |
|
|
02/1909 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3022 |
|
|
30/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (WEY) |
|
|
08/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (WOS) |
|
|