Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1539 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14945 Week
» 67961 Month
» 187488 Year
» 3214341 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D231 |
11/09/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40031 |
02/1974 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
SYLVANIA |
16/06/1962 |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
11/09/1959 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/09/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
05/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/09/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D231 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
24/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Naming |
Named 'SYLVANIA' |
|
|
07/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
20/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
19/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (1F) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
29/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
05/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40031 |
|
|
31/05/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40031 |
|
|
05/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|