Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 285 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2850 Week
» 1588 Month
» 415909 Year
» 1637474 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2310 22/12/1960  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 04
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
3' 7" engines22/12/1960
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
To Service 22/12/1960 to Gateshead (52A)
Withdrawn 01/02/1969
Time in Service 8 yrs, 1 mth , 10 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
52A Gateshead (New) on 22/12/1960
52F Blyth (North) w/e 21/01/1961
52G Sunderland w/e 20/05/1961
52E Percy Main w/e 08/06/1963
   Withdrawn on 01/02/1969

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
22/12/1960 To Service To service as British Railways Number D2310
Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
Allocated to Gateshead (52A)
   
21/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F)    
20/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
08/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Percy Main (52E)    
01/02/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D2310    

prev prev