Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 106 Today
» 1187 Yesterday
» 2420 Week
» 13713 Month
» 278346 Year
» 1499911 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 2322   01/1884

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Dean
Class Dean Goods
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 62
Works Number 967
To Service During 01/1884
Withdrawal During 06/1951
Service Life 67 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1884
WES Westbury 4w/e 26/01/1946
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC WES Westbury m/e 28/02/1946
ALLOC BRD Bristol Bath Road w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC SPM St Philips Marsh 4w/e 27/12/1947
ALLOC BRD Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 03/12/1949
WDN   m/e 30/06/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1884 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 2322
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 967
   
26/01/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (WES)    
06/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 2322    

prev prev