Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 466 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18269 Week
» 71285 Month
» 190812 Year
» 3217665 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
2323 |
|
01/1884 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean |
Class |
Dean Goods |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
62 |
Works Number |
968 |
To Service |
During 01/1884 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 30/06/1953 |
Service Life |
69 yrs, 5 mths , 30 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1884 |
MCH |
|
Machynlleth |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
89A |
|
Oswestry |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
30/06/1953 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
89A |
Oswestry |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/06/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1904 |
S2 boiler fitted |
08/1907 |
S4 boiler fitted |
03/1914 |
B4 boiler fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
27/03/1948 |
Barmouth |
On 27/3, the morning goods to Pwllheli was worked by No. 2323, painted green and remarkably clean, while No. 2572 was noted on the turntable later. |
SLS/194805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1884 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 2323 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 968 |
|
|
12/1904 |
Modification |
Modification: S2 boiler fitted |
|
|
08/1907 |
Modification |
Modification: S4 boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1914 |
Modification |
Modification: B4 boiler fitted |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Machynlleth (MCH) |
|
|
18/04/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oswestry (89A) |
|
|
30/06/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2323 |
|
|