Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 71 Today
» 966 Yesterday
» 2110 Week
» 21436 Month
» 248197 Year
» 759299 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2324 26/04/1961

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 04
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
To Service 26/04/1961
Withdrawn 08/07/1968
Time in Service 7 yrs, 2 mths , 12 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
55E Normanton (New) 26/04/1961
56A Knottingley 4w/e 12/08/1967
55B York (North) 4w/e 22/06/1968
   Withdrawn 08/07/1968

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
26/04/1961 To Service To service as D2324
Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
Allocated to Normanton (55E)
   
12/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Knottingley (56A)    
22/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (55B)    
08/07/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D2324    

prev prev