Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 78 Today
» 844 Yesterday
» 4344 Week
» 16122 Month
» 305514 Year
» 816616 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2325 29/04/1961

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 04
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
To Service 29/04/1961
Withdrawn 08/07/1968
Time in Service 7 yrs, 2 mths , 9 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
52A Gateshead (New) 29/04/1961
55A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 25/02/1967
50D Goole 4w/e 04/11/1967
   Withdrawn 08/07/1968

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
29/04/1961 To Service To service as D2325
Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
Allocated to Gateshead (52A)
   
25/02/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
04/11/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (50D)    
08/07/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D2325    

prev prev