Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 117 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4077 Week
» 33663 Month
» 407676 Year
» 1629241 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2329 21/06/1961  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 04
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
3' 7" engines21/06/1961
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
To Service 21/06/1961 to Heaton (52B)
Withdrawn 29/07/1968
Time in Service 7 yrs, 1 mth , 8 dys
Cut Up 01/02/1970
Cut At British Rail (at York Layerthorpe)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
52B Heaton (New) on 21/06/1961
52G Sunderland w/e 15/07/1961
52E Percy Main w/e 08/06/1963
   Withdrawn on 29/07/1968


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
21/06/1961 To Service To service as British Railways Number D2329
Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
Allocated to Heaton (52B)
   
15/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
08/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Percy Main (52E)    
29/07/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D2329    
01/02/1970 Scrapped Broken up by British Rail: at York Layerthorpe    

prev prev