Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 71 Today
» 966 Yesterday
» 2110 Week
» 21436 Month
» 248197 Year
» 759299 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2334 25/07/1961

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 04
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
To Service 25/07/1961
Withdrawn 08/07/1968
Time in Service 6 yrs, 11 mths , 13 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
52B Heaton (New) 25/07/1961
52E Percy Main w/e 08/06/1963
52A Gateshead 4w/e 30/01/1965
51A Darlington 4w/e 24/02/1968
   Withdrawn 08/07/1968

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
25/07/1961 To Service To service as D2334
Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
Allocated to Heaton (52B)
   
08/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Percy Main (52E)    
30/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
24/02/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
08/07/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D2334    

prev prev