Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 387 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 1259 Week
» 13037 Month
» 302429 Year
» 813531 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2337 30/08/1961

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 04
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
Works Number 2718
To Service 30/08/1961
Withdrawn 15/07/1968
Time in Service 6 yrs, 10 mths , 15 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
51A Darlington (New) 30/08/1961
   Withdrawn 15/07/1968

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
30/08/1961 To Service To service as D2337
Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd., Works Number 2718
Allocated to Darlington (51A)
   
15/07/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D2337    
03/08/1971 Sightings NCB Manvers Main Colliery: Around the works - Named 'Dorothy'. In yellow livery. RO 3/1972 Link
06/11/1971 Sightings NCB Manvers main coal preparation plant: Around the plant - Outside the shed. Named 'Dorothy' RO 4/1972 Link

prev prev