Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 146 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 146 Week
» 6280 Month
» 234164 Year
» 1455729 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 2340   06/1884

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Dean
Class Dean Goods
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 62
Works Number 985
To Service During 06/1884
Withdrawal During 06/1954
Service Life 70 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1884
22 Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 03/11/1945
BL   4w/e 26/01/1946
82D Westbury 4w/e 24/01/1953
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BL   4w/e 03/11/1945
ALLOC SPM St Philips Marsh m/e 28/02/1946
ALLOC 82D Westbury 4w/e 24/01/1953
WDN   m/e 30/06/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1948 Swindon Works New work August: No. 7016 CDF, 7017 G. J. Churchward PDN; 7430/32 STB, 7431/33 CNYD, 7434. No. 4160 is nearing completion (26/8). Locomotives entering Works during August included: Nos. *100A1, 1018, 1461, 1934/57, 2144, 2340, 2746/64, 2882, 2938/39, 3613/76, 3823/25/57, *3902, *3953, 4045/85, 4119, 4269, 4552, 4671, *4802, *4850, *4852, 4902/14/20/25/28/69/76, 5006/39/63/64/84, 5107/83, 5261, 5325, 5416/20, 5540, 5756, 5932/71/80/93, 6000/08/10/22, 6311/33/85, 6433. 6746, 6849/79, 6945/60, 7206/30, 7726/82, 7800/15, 8104, **8393, 8709, 9301. *Oil-burning. **Converted to 53XX. Works' pilots of late have been: Nos. 212 (since sent for scrap, w/e 21/8), 906, 1713, 1900, 2751 SLS/194810

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1884 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 2340
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 985
   
03/11/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (22)    
26/01/1946 Allocation      
24/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (82D)    
06/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 2340    

prev prev