Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1381 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14787 Week
» 67803 Month
» 187330 Year
» 3214183 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D235 |
28/09/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40035 |
03/1974 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
APAPA |
16/06/1962 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
28/09/1959 to Crewe North (5A) |
Withdrawn |
13/08/1984 |
Time in Service |
24 yrs, 10 mths , 16 dys |
Cut Up |
06/1985 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
Information |
Severe Bogie fractures, power unit. |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
28/09/1959 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/09/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
11/1974 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/09/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D235 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
21/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Naming |
Named 'APAPA' |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (1F) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40035 |
|
|
11/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
13/08/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40035 |
|
|
06/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|