Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 54 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17857 Week
» 70873 Month
» 190400 Year
» 3217253 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Departmental (Dept) |
91 |
06/1958 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2370 |
05/08/1967 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03370 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D91 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
05/08/1967 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2370 |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
25/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03370 |
|
|
19/12/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03370 |
|
|
16/07/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|