Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 133 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17936 Week
» 70952 Month
» 190479 Year
» 3217332 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2372 |
26/07/1961 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
03 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
To Service |
26/07/1961 to Widnes (8D) |
Withdrawn |
22/11/1970 |
Time in Service |
9 yrs, 3 mths , 27 dys |
Cut Up |
10/1971 |
Cut At |
Cohens (Kettering) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/07/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/07/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2372 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
18/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
31/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) |
|
|
11/04/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
25/04/1970 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
22/11/1970 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2372 |
|
|
10/1971 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|